Lee, Shirley (CPSO#: 64956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (877) 725-9965
Fax: (613) 248-3761
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shirley Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lee ( CPSO# 64956 )

Business Address:
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone Number: (877) 725-9965

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRLEY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993