Lee, Shui Hing (CPSO#: 33413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of New South Wales, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 255
4231 Hazelbridge Way
Richmond BC  V6X 3L7
Phone: (604) 273-6767
Fax: (604) 273-6730
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2540 Shaughnessy Street
Port Coquitlam BC  V3C 3W4
Canada
Phone: (604) 944-9092
Fax: (604) 944-9582
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - North Dakota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 24, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Shui Hing Lee, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lee to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: 

                  Dr. Shui Hing Lee shall:
                  
                  (i)   advise all patients that I am not authorized to perform cataract
                        extraction and intraocular lens implant surgery independently; and
                  
                  (ii)  only perform cataract extraction and intraocular lens implant
                        surgery under the direct supervision of a supervising
                        ophthalmologist, acceptable to and approved by the College who must
                        be present throughout the entire surgical procedure and intervene
                        if necessary.