Lee, Stella (CPSO#: 89828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mezzanine
396 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone: (416) 928-9343
Fax: (416) 928-9368
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harvey H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lee ( CPSO# 89828 )
Dr. H. Wong ( CPSO# 82602 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4758

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Bond Wing
Room 6044
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6059

Business Address:
396 St. Claire Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone Number: (416) 928-9343

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STELLA LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008