Lee, Sung Hee (CPSO#: 84092)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ewha Women's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2006 to 05 May 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 May 2006 to 14 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007