Lee, Susan Ming (CPSO#: 86795)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Columbian Hospital
Anesthesiology Department
330 E Columbia St.
New Westminster BC  V3L3W7
Phone: 6045204253

Medical Records Location

Address: Woodstock General Hospital Dept. of Anesthesia 310 Juliana Dr Woodstock, ON N4V 0A4
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to Woodstock General Hospital.
Date Received: 11 May 2018


Address: Woodstock General Hospital Department of Anesthesia 210 Juliana Dr Woodstock, ON N4V 0A4
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to the address above.
Date Received: 02 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018