Lee, Thomas Chung Hoon (CPSO#: 75140)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 20 Chapel Street BPH5 Brookline MA 02446 United States
Date Received: 25 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016