Lee, Trevor William Richmond (CPSO#: 74514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
St. Boniface General Hospital
L2035-409 Tache Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R2H 2A6
Phone: (204) 237-2580
Fax: (204) 231-0425

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR WILLIAM RICHMOND LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2000 to 03 Mar 2000
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2002