Lee, Vivian Thanh Phong (CPSO#: 58547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 223-9284
Fax: (416) 223-3320
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.T.P. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lee ( CPSO# 58547 )

Business Address:
303 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 223-9284

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN THANH PHONG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Aug 1988 to 14 Oct 1988
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989