Lee, William Leslie (CPSO#: 21538)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 18, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Lee was subject to an investigation by the College. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Lee resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.