Lee, Winnie Wing Suet (CPSO#: 68146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bay College Medical Centre
C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C8
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Winnie W.S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lee ( CPSO# 68146 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
350 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3N2
Phone Number: (416) 291-9007

Business Address:
Bay College Medical Centre
C216 - 777 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C8
Phone Number: (416) 977-8878

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINNIE WING SUET LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996