Lee, Won Jae Kenny (CPSO#: 99159)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2014