Lee, Wonyeol (CPSO#: 106104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Durham Regional Hwy 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: 905-723-8551 Ext. 5257
Fax: 905-721-6172
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oshawa Clinic
117 King St. East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

5995 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 5P7
Canada
Phone: 416-297-5330
Fax: 416-297-9727
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wonyeol Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lee ( CPSO# 106104)

Business Address:
LHEARN Centre
Department of Family Medicine
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  M4J 6T3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WONYEOL LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2017