Lee, Yong Sun (CPSO#: 101000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3155 HARVESTER ROAD
SUITE 302
Burlington ON  L7N 3N8
Phone: (289) 217-7947
Fax: 888-261-7116
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y.S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lee ( CPSO# 101000)

Business Address:
302 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N8
Phone Number: (289) 217-7947

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YONG SUN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015