Lee, Yoon-Jae (CPSO#: 32921)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005