Lee, Young Min (CPSO#: 42513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10815 Bathurst St., unit 23
Richmond Hill, Ontario
L4C 9Y2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9Y2
Phone: 905-7801050
Fax: 905-780-2640
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Young Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lee ( CPSO# 42513 )

Business Address:
23 - 10815 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9Y2
Phone Number: (905) 780-1050

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUNG MIN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2004
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 21 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2006

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Apr 2005
Summary:

 On April 25, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Young Min Lee to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct 
 with respect to hugs of a patient within a psychotherapeutic relationship.

On September 21, 2005, 
 the Discipline Committee ordered the following:	

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. Lee(s certificate 
 of registration for a period of six (6) months from the date of this order (September 21, 2005), 
 the entire period of which shall be suspended.

2.	The following term, condition and limitation be 
 imposed on Dr. Lee(s certificate of registration:  

(a)	Dr. Lee must successfully complete the 
 College(s course on boundary issues at his own expense within a period of six (6) months of the 
 order and that proof of successful completion be provided to the Registrar forthwith.

3.	Dr. Lee 
 is required to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.

4.	The results of this proceeding be 
 included in the register.

Note regarding paragraph 2 (a) above:  On April 7, 2006, Dr. Lee 
 successfully completed the College(s course on boundary issues.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 31 Oct 2005
Hearing Date(s): Jan 31, 2005