Lee, Yuna (CPSO#: 68823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
4 C C W 149
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3109
Fax: (416) 864-5714
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuna Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lee ( CPSO# 68823 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
4 C C W 149
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUNA LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999