Lee, Yung (CPSO#: 84909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Department Of Anesthesia
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yung Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lee ( CPSO# 84909 )

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Department of Anesthesia
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2017