Lee-Evoy, Janet Catherine (CPSO#: 100682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Department of Psychiatry
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET CATHERINE LEE-EVOY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LEE-EVOY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. LEE-EVOY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LEE-EVOY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LEE-EVOY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LEE-EVOY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LEE-EVOY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018