Lee-Wing, Matthew Wahkeung (CPSO#: 66154)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2002