Lees, Bonnie Jean (CPSO#: 31185)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2012