Lees, Nicholas Michael (CPSO#: 93014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
222 Fairview Dr
Brantford ON  N3R 2W9
Phone: 519 756-4310
Fax: 519-752-2256
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. M. Lees Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lees ( CPSO# 93014 )

Business Address:
205 - 222 Fairview Drive
Brantford ON  N3R 2W9
Phone Number: (519) 756-4310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS MICHAEL LEES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012