Lefebvre, Christine Marie (CPSO#: 103621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
265 Yorkland Blvd, Unit 403
North York ON  M2J 1S5
Phone: 416-229-2399
Fax: 416-229-9771
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE LEFEBVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFEBVRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2017