Lefebvre, Jeanne Marie Jacqueline (CPSO#: 57091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. M. Jacqueline LeFebvre, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lefebvre ( CPSO# 57091 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital - General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital - Birchmount Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEANNE MARIE JACQUELINE LEFEBVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFEBVRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 01 Jul 1990
Resident 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1988