Lefebvre, Marie-Astrid (CPSO#: 105687)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Walk-In Pediatrics Clinic Suite 106 222 Dixon Road Etobicoke, ON M9P 3S5
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016