Lefebvre, Paul (CPSO#: 29056)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Nov 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 1999