Lefebvre, Pierre David (CPSO#: 55283)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Feb 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 1995