Lefebvre, Sylvie Francine Marie (CPSO#: 58385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SYLVIE FRANCINE MARIE LEFEBVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFEBVRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1989