Lefebvre, Yves Andre (CPSO#: 67963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yves Lefebvre Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2006

Dr. Y. Lefebvre ( CPSO# 67963 )

Business Address:
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone Number: (613) 446-7677


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. YVES ANDRE LEFEBVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFEBVRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 1998 to 30 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996