Lefkowitz, Ariel Michael Feig (CPSO#: 101463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Lefkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lefkowitz ( CPSO# 32044 )
Dr. D. Feig ( CPSO# 50539 )
Dr. A. Lefkowitz ( CPSO# 101463)

Business Address:
650 Sammon Avenue
K Wing
Suite 403
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 778-0000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIEL MICHAEL FEIG LEFKOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFKOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2017