Lefkowitz, Arthur Charles Joel (CPSO#: 32044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite K403
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 778-0000
Fax: (416) 778-5852
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Cardiology Associates Inc.
837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1L2
Canada
Phone: (416) 465-5464
Fax: (416) 465-0445
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Lefkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lefkowitz ( CPSO# 32044 )
Dr. D. Feig ( CPSO# 50539 )
Dr. A. Lefkowitz ( CPSO# 101463)

Business Address:
650 Sammon Avenue
K Wing
Suite 403
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 778-0000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR CHARLES JOEL LEFKOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFKOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984