Lefkowitz, Jacob Maurice (CPSO#: 52696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7131 Bathurst Street
Suite 303
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone: (905) 731-5554
Fax: (905) 709-7722
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lefkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lefkowitz ( CPSO# 52696 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone Number: (905) 731-5554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACOB MAURICE LEFKOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFKOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984