Legault, Joseph William Paul (CPSO#: 55432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Centre
3001 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Y6
Phone: (613) 596-2872
Fax: (613) 596-6569
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul J.W. Legault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Legault ( CPSO# 55432 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Centre
3001 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Y6
Phone Number: (613) 596-2872

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-7878

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH WILLIAM PAUL LEGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGAULT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1989