Legault, Sandra Marie Flore (CPSO#: 80498)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011