Leger, Chantal Stefanie (CPSO#: 70214)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2002