Leger, Daniel (CPSO#: 84539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone: (519) 666-1610
Fax: (519) 666-0281
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1340 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 3R3
Canada
Phone: (519) 455-3910
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Leger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leger ( CPSO# 84539 )

Business Address:
Kensington Village
1340 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 455-3910

Business Address:
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone Number: (519) 666-1610

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL LEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008