Leger-Nolet, Celine Nicole (CPSO#: 69894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-1088 Ext. 2434
Fax: (705) 647-1065
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Leger-Nolet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leger-Nolet ( CPSO# 69894 )

Business Address:
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-1722

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jan 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CELINE NICOLE LEGER-NOLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGER-NOLET is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 20 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 19 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Jan 2001 to 31 May 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2001