Legere, Janice Marie (CPSO#: 69438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brant Community Health
Care System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

John Noble Home
97 Mount Pleasant Road
Brantford ON  N3T 1T5
Canada
Phone: (519) 756-2920
Fax: (519) 756-7942
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Stedman Community Hospice
Hankinson House
445 Grey Street
Brantford ON  N3S 6X1
Canada
Phone: 5197517096 Ext. 2500
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janice M Legere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Legere ( CPSO# 69438 )

Business Address:
445 Grey Street
Brantford ON  N3S 6X1
Phone Number: (519) 751-7096

Business Address:
Brant Community Health Care System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
97 Mount Pleasant Road
Brantford ON  N3T 1T5
Phone Number: (519) 756-2920

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE MARIE LEGERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGERE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1998