Legge, Alastair Murray (CPSO#: 30965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Rosegarden Cr,
Richmond Hill
ON, CA
L4E 2P3
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 2P3
Phone: 905-773-6293
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Legge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Millson ( CPSO# 30966 )
Dr. A. Legge ( CPSO# 30965 )

Business Address:
25 Rosegarden Crescent
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 773-6293

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALASTAIR MURRAY LEGGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGGE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1979