Legrand-Westfall, Lorraine (CPSO#: 50919)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Legrand, Lorraine (used until: 11 Apr 1983 )

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Nov 1992