Lehman, Robert Malcolm (CPSO#: 30827)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993