Lehr, Anab Rebecca (CPSO#: 108259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
Division of Pediatric Critical Care
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAB REBECCA LEHR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LEHR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. LEHR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LEHR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LEHR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LEHR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LEHR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 30 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017