Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lei, Calvin Zong Hong (CPSO#: 64533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 108
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 929-1900
Fax: (416) 929-7316
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Calvin Lei Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lei ( CPSO# 64533 )

Business Address:
108 - 790 Bay Street East
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 929-1900

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CALVIN ZONG HONG LEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1992