Leibl, Raymond Danny (CPSO#: 23915)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 21 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Sep 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1971
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2001
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 21 Sep 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Jun 2001
Summary:

 On June 22, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Leibl guilty of professional misconduct for 
 failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in regard to the therapy he 
 provided to patients, improperly used his authority to prescribe or dispense a drug and prescribed 
 and dispensed drugs to a patient for an improper purpose.  Dr. Leibl was also found guilty of 
 professional misconduct with respect to engaging in sexual impropriety with a patient and verbally 
 and physically abusing a patient.  Dr. Leibl failed to maintain the patient records a physician is 
 required to maintain and falsified a record regarding an examination or treatment of a patient; 
 all of this to be considered a display of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct 
 unbecoming a physican. Dr.Leibl was found to be incompetent.

Having heard a motion for 
 adjournment of the penalty hearing, the Discipline Committee ordered as a condition of his 
 certificate of registration,  that Dr. Leibl(s certificate of registration be suspended effective 
 Tuesday, July 24, 2001, at 12:01 a.m. until the disposition of the penalty hearing is disposed 
 of.

On September 20, 2001, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Leibl be reprimanded, the 
 fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Register and that his certificate of registration be 
 revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 17 Sep 2002
Hearing Date(s): Dec 11, 2000