Leibow, David Barry (CPSO#: 29093)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001