Leibow, Deborah Frances (CPSO#: 31365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Mar 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ava Road
Toronto ON  M5P 1Y7
Phone: (416) 487-2743
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deborah Leibow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leibow ( CPSO# 31365 )

Business Address:
41 Ava Road
Toronto ON  M5P 1Y7
Phone Number: (416) 487-2743

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH FRANCES LEIBOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIBOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1980