Leichner, Pierre Paul (CPSO#: 29445)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999