Leicht, Richard Tadeusz (CPSO#: 52705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winnipeg Clinic
425 St Mary Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3C 0N2
Phone: (204) 957-3343

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 11 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD TADEUSZ LEICHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEICHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984