Leifso, Lowell Robb (CPSO#: 52601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Surrey Sdl
PO Box 4700 Stn Terminal
Vancouver BC  V6B 1J1
Phone: (604) 232-7022

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOWELL ROBB LEIFSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIFSO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1997