Leighl, Natasha Basant (CPSO#: 69795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4645
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natasha Leighl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Leighl ( CPSO# 69795 )

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4645

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
Suite 7-913
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4645

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA BASANT LEIGHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIGHL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 1996 to 07 Apr 1996
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998