Leighton, Christopher Cecil (CPSO#: 65256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Windsor Campus
Medical Education Building
401 Sunset Avenue
Windsor ON  N9B 3P4
Phone: (519) 253-3000 Ext. 4306
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CECIL LEIGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIGHTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993